+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1096.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1007.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 485.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 18, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB137 Emmerson
- Yeas: 39
May 23, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
April 22, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 9, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 6