+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 359, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5429.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6301.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11).
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4761.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4677.) (April 16).
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4535.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 20, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1363 Moorlach et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2018: SB 1363 Moorlach Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
June 27, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
June 11, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1363 Moorlach et al.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 4, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1