+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 72, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 5621.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11).
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 7. Page 3013.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 2977.) (March 26).
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 26.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 19, 2014: SB 1360 Padilla Senate Third Reading By ALEJO
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 5
April 1, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1360 Padilla
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 9
March 26, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor