+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 426, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5384.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10).
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4570.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4440.) (June 27).
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 27.
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (4)
August 31, 2022: SB 1358 Portantino Third Reading Urgency By Holden
- Yeas: 80
August 31, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1358 Portantino Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1358 Portantino Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
June 27, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor