+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- June 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- June 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and V.A.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4315.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4309.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4823.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4629.) (April 10).
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on V.A. and T. & H.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
May 30, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1357 Gaines et al.
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 7, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
April 24, 2018: No Votes Recorded: Morrell, Wieckowski
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
April 10, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing]
- Yeas: 7