+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3310.) (April 29).
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3281.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29 in JUD. pending receipt.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 19, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor