+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 322, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4605.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6124.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and AGRI.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3326.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3278.) (April 28).
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 19, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1353 Nielsen Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
August 18, 2014: SB 1353 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By OLSEN
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
July 2, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 18, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
June 4, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1353 Nielsen
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
April 28, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor