+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3435.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19 in HUMAN S. pending receipt.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 7).
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referral to Com. on HOUSING rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HUMAN S., and HOUSING.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor