+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died on the inactive file.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hill.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3717.) (May 27).
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3575.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On May 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27 in B. & F.I. pending receipt.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to second reading.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3403.) (May 6).
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3162.) (April 9).
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 27, 2014: From Committee: Amendments returned to Senate floor for consideration.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 9, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor