+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
- From Assembly without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3973.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3793.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3415.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 22, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 26, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1351 Durazo et al.
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 10
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 2, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 18, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor