+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 258, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4411.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 5907.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to Com. on ED.) suspended. (Page 5606.)
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 3699.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3715.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3036.) (April 2).
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 26.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 11, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1349 Jackson Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
August 7, 2014: SB 1349 Jackson Senate Third Reading By BONILLA
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 6
June 24, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1349 Jackson
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 28, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1