+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4533.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 16, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 4, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor