+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 846, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6167.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3644.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3714.) (May 23).
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3344.) (April 30).
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 19, 2014: SB 1341 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By STONE
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1341 Mitchell
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
May 19, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 30, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor