+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 257, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 5910.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (July 2).
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 3492.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3342.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3018.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 1.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E.Q.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 7, 2014: SB 1332 Wolk Senate Third Reading By ALEJO
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
July 2, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
June 17, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 19, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1332 Wolk
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 7
April 30, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
April 1, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor