+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 481, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 3488.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2982.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3026.)
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3004.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (September 11).
On August 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 29).
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 2689.)
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
On July 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11).
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1072.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 974.) (May 3).
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 15, 2017: Unfinished Business SB133 Hernandez et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 15, 2017: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 9
September 15, 2017: SB 133 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WOOD
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 10
September 11, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
August 29, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 5
August 21, 2017: SB 133 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WOOD Amend By WOOD Set #1
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 8
July 11, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
May 15, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd SB133
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 3, 2017: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor