+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
- From Assembly without further action.
On June 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 22 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and A. & A.R.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3972.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3792.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3252.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3169.) (March 21).
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R., G.O., and JUD.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 21 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
May 26, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1328 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 29, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
March 21, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor