+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3437.) (April 19).
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3347.) (April 6).
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- March 30 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 30.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor