+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referral to Com. on N.R. & W. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- April 1 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 1.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor