+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Ordered to second reading.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3340.) (April 30).
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 30, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor