+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 336, Statutes of 2022.
On September 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 3911.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3517.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
August 30, 2022: SB 1314 Limón Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 10
August 11, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
June 20, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1314 Limón
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 7
April 26, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor