+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (35)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On September 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 5337.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 22).
On June 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 3971.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3792.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3. Page 3441.) (April 19).
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1309 Durazo Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 5
August 30, 2022: SB 1309 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Santiago
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
June 22, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1309 Durazo
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 10
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 9, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor