+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 29 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and ED.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3987.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3791.) (May 19).
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3457.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3218.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 24.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and G.O.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
June 22, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2022: Special Consent SB1308
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 20, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
March 24, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor