+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor