+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 694, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4605.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 6120.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6016.)
On July 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 9).
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3320.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3161.) (April 9).
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 19, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1301 DeSaulnier Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
August 18, 2014: SB 1301 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By ACHADJIAN
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
June 9, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
May 1, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1301 DeSaulnier
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
April 9, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor