+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
- From Assembly without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 14 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3935.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3791.) (May 19).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3326.) (April 5).
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3253.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5 in JUD. pending receipt.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
June 28, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2022: Special Consent SB1300
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 5, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor