+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 37.) (August 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 19.
On July 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- To print.
- Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on T. & I.D.
+ − Votes (2)
August 19, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
August 19, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor