+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 794, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 6175.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 7101.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 16).
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4352.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4307.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 14.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4783.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1294 Bradford et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
August 31, 2018: SB 1294 Bradford Senate Third Reading By COOLEY
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 4
June 26, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1294 Bradford
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 14, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 23, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor