+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 241, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2242.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2728.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 10).
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 385.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 20.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2019: Special Consent SB129
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 15, 2019: SB 129 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 10, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 2
June 25, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
April 22, 2019: Consent Calendar SB129
- Yeas: 38
March 20, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor