+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5533.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6085.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5960.)
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 28).
On June 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4088.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4007.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3611.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2016: Unfinished Business (Supplemental File 1) SB1289 Lara Concurrence
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2016: SB 1289 Lara Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
August 19, 2016: SB 1289 Lara Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
August 11, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
June 28, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
June 1, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1289 Lara
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 16, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor