+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 1.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor