+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analysis
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor