+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 321, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4946.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6545.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6284.)
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3663.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3713.) (May 23).
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 29).
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3280.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29 in JUD. pending receipt.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24 in HEALTH pending receipt.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3035.) (April 2).
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
- Set for hearing March 26.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED., HEALTH, and JUD.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 28, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1266 Huff Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
August 27, 2014: SB 1266 Huff Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
June 17, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education.
- Yeas: 10
May 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1266 Huff
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
May 19, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 9
April 2, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Health.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor