+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5363.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5894.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 3).
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5473.)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and L. GOV.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 3952.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3609.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3313.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 24, 2016: Unfinished Business SB1262 Pavley Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
August 18, 2016: SB 1262 Pavley Senate Third Reading By LEVINE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 3, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 6
June 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
May 26, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1262 Pavley
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 5
April 20, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
March 29, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor