+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 465, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5692.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6517.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 23. Page 5924.)
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4213.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4970.) (May 7).
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4822.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1262 Beall Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2018: SB 1262 Beall Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
August 15, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 25, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
May 21, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1262 Newman
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 7, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor