+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 27 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 3969.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3790.) (May 19).
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3517.) (April 26).
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3238.) (March 28).
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 28.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and N.R. & W.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
May 26, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1261 Stern et al.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 28, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 4