+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 842, Statutes of 2022.
On September 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5273.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 18. Page 5952.)
- Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 21).
On June 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3826.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3596.) (May 3).
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3309.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1260 Durazo Concurrence
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2022: SB 1260 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Ting
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 6
August 18, 2022: SB 1260 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Ting Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 10
June 15, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 23, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1260 Durazo
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
May 3, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor