+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6109.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10).
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 5, 2018: SB 1259 Nielsen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
June 27, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
June 11, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
April 30, 2018: Consent Calendar SB1259 Nielsen
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
April 10, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor