+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 245, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
On August 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4853.)
- Set for hearing August 16.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4809.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5829.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3).
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3647.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3437.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (7)
August 17, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1259 Laird Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 16, 2022: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 3
August 11, 2022: SB 1259 Laird Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 3, 2022: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2022: Consent Calendar SB1259
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
April 19, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor