+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 5226.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 20).
On August 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 3840.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3771.) (June 18).
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 18.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 9.
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- June 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 1.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 14 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt.
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2020: Unfinished Business SB1257 Durazo et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
August 26, 2020: SB 1257 Durazo Senate Third Reading By RIVAS, L.
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 9
August 20, 2020: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 4
July 29, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2020: Senate 3rd Reading SB1257 Durazo
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
June 18, 2020: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 9, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 14, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1