+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3377.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
April 4, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor