+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3643.) Reconsideration granted.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 6 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 20, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
April 20, 2016: [First] hearing set for [04-20-2016]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor