+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Held under submission.
- Set, second hearing.
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3607.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3712.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3255.) (April 24).
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 26.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
May 27, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1248 Lara
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
May 12, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor