+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 30).
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1247.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1147.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 11.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 507.) (April 7).
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 2, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB124 Leno
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 11, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 7, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 7, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor