+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (35)
On September 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 3.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5420.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 20).
On August 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On August 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- July 27 hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 3876.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3770.) (June 18).
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 18.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 9.
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 1.
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3550.) (May 18).
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- March 30 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 30.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2020: Unfinished Business SB1237 Dodd et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
August 31, 2020: SB 1237 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Burke
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 11
August 10, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
August 10, 2020: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 26, 2020: Senate 3rd Reading SB1237 Dodd et al.
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
June 18, 2020: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 9, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 18, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1