+ − Summaries (13)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (46)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5494.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 5456.)
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 26.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5326.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6098.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22).
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) . Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On May 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1196.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1147.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 860.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 721.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 15.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (15)
August 29, 2016: Unfinished Business SB123 Liu Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
August 26, 2016: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 9
August 23, 2016: SB 123 Liu Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 20
June 22, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 14, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 7
June 6, 2016: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
June 23, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 19
June 23, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 19
June 1, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB123 Liu
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 18, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 22, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 22, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9