+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 485, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5522.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5902.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
On August 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and V.A.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4063.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4006.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3524.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 12.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3313.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and V.A.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
August 30, 2016: Unfinished Business (Supplemental File 1) SB1227 Lara Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
August 18, 2016: SB 1227 Lara Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 3, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
June 28, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
June 22, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1227 Lara
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 2, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 12, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
March 29, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor