+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 423, Statutes of 2022.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5021.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 5887.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 3).
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3828.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3. Page 3521.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 7).
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referral to Com. on E.Q. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., TRANS., and E.Q.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 23, 2022: Unfinished Business SB1226 Durazo et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
August 15, 2022: SB 1226 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Lee
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
August 3, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
May 23, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1226 Durazo
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
April 26, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1