+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Arambula.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 5. Page 4384.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4306.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4811.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 18 hearing postponed by committee.
- Set for hearing April 18.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4439.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 21.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
June 26, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
May 30, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1225 Glazer et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 5
May 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 7, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
March 21, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor