+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 7. Page 3607.)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
April 20, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor