+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3616.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor